WV SB140 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Office of Miners' Health, Safety and Training promulgate legislative rule relating to substance abuse screening, standards and procedure
Title
Authorizing Department of Commerce promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Sen. Herb Snyder [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 62) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 62) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 375) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 374) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 62) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 375) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 374) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 62) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 62) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 375) |
2014-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 374) |
2014-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-07 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-25 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2014-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Labor |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Labor then Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 10 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 10 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |