WV SB14 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating WV Farm-to-School Grant Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating WV Farm-to-School Grant Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 103) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-27HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-12HouseTo House Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-02-12HouseTo Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-11SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 103)
2019-02-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-11SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-07SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-07SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-06SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2019-01-25SenateTo Finance
2019-01-25SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2019-01-09SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development then Finance
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19361New CodeSee Bill Text
19362New CodeSee Bill Text
19363New CodeSee Bill Text
19364New CodeSee Bill Text
19371Amended CodeCitation Text
19372Amended CodeCitation Text
19373Amended CodeCitation Text
19374Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback