WV SB14 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the West Virginiana Public Charter Schools Act of 2015. The bill provides purpose and intent. The bill defines terms. The bill establishes that charter schools are subject to certain requirements and exempt from certain requirements. The bill provides for creation or conversion of charter schools. The bill provides an application process. The bill provides approval for approval and denials of applications. The bill provides for governing bodies and their duties. The bill provides what a charter school must do. The bill provides for funding. The bill provides for enrollment. The bill provides for student transportation. The bill requires the State Superintendent to provide information on charter schools to the public. The bill provides for school personnel policies. The bill provides for termination of a charter school. The bill provides for charter school evaluations.
Title
Creating Public Charter Schools Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Chris Walters [R] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. William Cole [R] |
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 25) (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Motion to postpone indefinitely rejected (Roll No. 38) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Chair's ruling sustained (Roll No. 2) (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Motion to postpone indefinitely rejected (Roll No. 38) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Chair's ruling sustained (Roll No. 2) (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-14 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2015-03-13 | House | Placed at foot of calendar |
2015-03-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment pending |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-03-06 | House | To House Finance |
2015-03-06 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-03-03 | House | To House Education |
2015-03-03 | House | To Education |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 25) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 1st reading |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Motion |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/1/15 with right to amend |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/28/15 with right to amend |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Motion |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/27/15 with right to amend |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 1st reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/26/15 with right to amend |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Motion to postpone indefinitely rejected (Roll No. 38) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Chair's ruling sustained (Roll No. 2) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Point of Order |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Move to discharge the committee from consideration |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Motion |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2015-01-14 | Senate | To Education |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-14 | Senate | To Education |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
hb2014 (Same As) 2015-01-14 - To House Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 20 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 33 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 33 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 7A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6C | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |