WV SB130 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB130

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 342, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to procedure for driver's license suspension and revocation for DUI

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procedure for driver's license suspension and revocation for DUI

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 534) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 633) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 198) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-14SenateChapter 342, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-18SenateTo Governor 3/18/20
2020-03-06SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-06SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 534)
2020-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-06HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-06HousePassed House (Roll No. 633)
2020-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HouseFrom House Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on Special Calendar
2020-03-06HouseFrom Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-03-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-04HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-03HouseRead 1st time
2020-03-03HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-02HouseDo pass
2020-02-21HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-21HouseTo Judiciary
2020-02-21HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-21SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-21SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 198)
2020-02-21SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-21SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-20SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-20SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-19SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-19SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-18Senate2nd reference dispensed
2020-02-18SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2020-01-08SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-08SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2020-01-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB130 (Carry Over) 2019-01-09 - To Pensions

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17C512Amended CodeCitation Text
17C52Amended CodeCitation Text
17C52aAmended CodeCitation Text
17C52bAmended CodeCitation Text
17C54Amended CodeCitation Text
17C57Amended CodeCitation Text
17C57aNew CodeSee Bill Text
17C5A1Amended CodeCitation Text
17C5A1aAmended CodeCitation Text
17C5A2bNew CodeSee Bill Text
17C5A3Amended CodeCitation Text
17C5C1aNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback