WV SB121 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing DEP promulgate legislative rule relating to requirements governing groundwater standards
Title
Authorizing DEP promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Karen Facemyer [R] | Sen. Joseph Minard [D] | Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] |
Sen. Herb Snyder [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-18 - House - Override Veto (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-11 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Override Veto (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-11 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 109, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-28 | To Governor 3/28/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Effective ninety days from passage | |
2011-03-18 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-18 | House Message received | |
2011-03-18 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-18 | Effective date rejected (Roll No. 499) | |
2011-03-18 | Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 498) | |
2011-03-18 | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-18 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-18 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-18 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 1) | |
2011-03-18 | Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 1) | |
2011-03-18 | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) | |
2011-03-18 | Vetoed by Governor 3/17/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Vetoed by Governor 3/17/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-17 | Vetoed by Governor 3/17/11 | |
2011-03-16 | To Governor 3/16/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-16 | To Governor 3/16/11 | |
2011-03-16 | To Governor 3/16/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-11 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-11 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 317) | |
2011-03-11 | Passed House (Roll No. 316) | |
2011-03-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-03-01 | To Judiciary | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-28 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-28 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) | |
2011-02-28 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) | |
2011-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-24 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-23 | Committee substitute reported | |
2011-02-01 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-01 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-01-18 | To Natural Resources | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-01-18 | To Natural Resources then Judiciary | |
2011-01-18 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |