WV SB106 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Alleviating double taxation on foreign income at state level
Title
Alleviating double taxation on foreign income at state level
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-17 | House | To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development |
2019-01-17 | House | To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Finance |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 6) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |