WV SB1040 | 2019 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - To House Select Committee on Education Reform B
Pending: House Select Committee on Education B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Education Savings Account Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Savings Account Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 66) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 65) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Motion for immediate consideration rejected (Roll No. 59) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17HouseTo House Select Committee on Education Reform B
2019-06-17HouseTo Select Committee on Education Reform B
2019-06-17HouseIntroduced in House
2019-06-03SenateOrdered to House
2019-06-03SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 66)
2019-06-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-06-03SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 65)
2019-06-03SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-06-03SenateRead 2nd time
2019-06-03SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-06-02SenateRead 1st time
2019-06-02SenateReported do pass
2019-06-02SenateTo Rules
2019-06-02SenateTo Rules
2019-06-02SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-06-01SenateMotion for immediate consideration rejected (Roll No. 59)
2019-06-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-06-01SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18311New CodeSee Bill Text
18312New CodeSee Bill Text
18313New CodeSee Bill Text
18314New CodeSee Bill Text
18315New CodeSee Bill Text
18316New CodeSee Bill Text
18317New CodeSee Bill Text
18318New CodeSee Bill Text
18319New CodeSee Bill Text
1881Amended CodeCitation Text
189A10aNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback