WV SB1033 | 2023 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-29 - Chapter 18, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this supplemental appropriation bill is to supplement, amend, and increase an existing item of appropriation in the aforesaid account for the designated spending unit for expenditure during the fiscal year 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making supplemental appropriation of federal funds to Department of Commerce, Geological and Economic Survey

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-08-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 855) (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-08-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 854) (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-08-08 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 853) (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-08-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 34) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-06 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 33) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-29SenateChapter 18, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2023
2023-08-08SenateApproved by Governor 8/14/23 - Senate Journal
2023-08-08HouseApproved by Governor 8/14/23 - House Journal
2023-08-14SenateApproved by Governor 8/14/23
2023-08-08HouseTo Governor 8/9/23 - House Journal
2023-08-08SenateTo Governor 8/9/23 - Senate Journal
2023-08-09SenateTo Governor 8/9/23
2023-08-08SenateHouse Message received
2023-08-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2023-08-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-08-08HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 855)
2023-08-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 854)
2023-08-08HouseRead 3rd time
2023-08-08HouseRead 2nd time
2023-08-08HouseDispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 853)
2023-08-08HouseRead 1st time
2023-08-08HouseImmediate consideration
2023-08-08HouseReference dispensed
2023-08-08HouseIntroduced in House
2023-08-06SenateOrdered to House
2023-08-06SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 34)
2023-08-06SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 34)
2023-08-06SenateRead 3rd time
2023-08-06SenateRead 2nd time
2023-08-06SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 33)
2023-08-06SenateRead 1st time
2023-08-06SenateImmediate consideration
2023-08-06SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2023-08-06SenateIntroduced in Senate
2023-08-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB133 (Similar To) 2023-08-08 - Placed on House Calendar

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback