WV SB1025 | 2019 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 18 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Supplemental appropriation to DHHR, Division of Human Services for fiscal year ending June 30, 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental appropriation to DHHR, Division of Human Services for fiscal year ending June 30, 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 846) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 845) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 31) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 31) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 30) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateHouse Message received
2019-06-18HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-06-18HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-06-18HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 846)
2019-06-18HousePassed House (Roll No. 845)
2019-06-18HouseRead 3rd time
2019-06-18HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-06-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-06-17HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-05-20HouseRead 1st time
2019-05-20HouseImmediate consideration
2019-05-20HouseReference dispensed
2019-05-20HouseIntroduced in House
2019-05-20SenateOrdered to House
2019-05-20SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 31)
2019-05-20SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 31)
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-20SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 30)
2019-05-20SenateRead 1st time
2019-05-20SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2019-05-20SenateImmediate consideration
2019-05-20SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-05-20SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback