WV SB1013 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Chapter 1, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Chapter 1, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Bill
Title
Budget Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-16 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 672) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 671) (Y: 62 N: 23 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 670) (Y: 55 N: 31 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 54) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 53) (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 650) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 649) (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 648) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 647) (Y: 35 N: 58 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 42) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 44) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 43) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 671) (Y: 62 N: 23 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 670) (Y: 55 N: 31 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 54) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 53) (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 650) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 649) (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 648) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 647) (Y: 35 N: 58 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 42) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 44) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 43) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Chapter 1, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2017 |
2017-06-26 | House | Became law without Governor's signature- House Journal |
2017-06-24 | Senate | Became law 6/24/17 |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Became law without Governor's signature - Senate Journal |
2017-06-26 | Senate | To Governor 6/19/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-06-19 | Senate | To Governor 6/19/17 |
2017-06-26 | House | To Governor 6/19/17 - House Journal |
2017-06-16 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-06-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-06-16 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 672) |
2017-06-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 671) |
2017-06-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 670) |
2017-06-16 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 54) |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 53) |
2017-06-16 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-06-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-06-14 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 650) |
2017-06-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 649) |
2017-06-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-06-14 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 648) |
2017-06-14 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-06-14 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 647) |
2017-06-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-06-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-06-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-06-13 | House | Immediate consideration |
2017-06-13 | House | Reference dispensed |
2017-06-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 44) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 43) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 42) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 2nd reading |
2017-06-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 6/9/17 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 6/8/17 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 6/7/17 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB115 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar