WV SB1013 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Chapter 3, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Chapter 3, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Bill
Title
Budget Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 730) (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 729) (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 38) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 38) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 33) (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 720) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 719) (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 718) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 717) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 716) (Y: 33 N: 63 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 26) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-11 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 25) (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 11) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 11) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 676) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 675) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 2) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 729) (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 38) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 38) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 33) (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 720) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 719) (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 718) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 717) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 716) (Y: 33 N: 63 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 26) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-11 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 25) (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 11) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 11) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 676) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 675) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 2) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | Senate | Chapter 3, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2016 |
2016-06-14 | House | Approved by Governor with reductions 6/17/16 - House Journal |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor with reductions 6/17/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor with reductions 6/17/16 |
2016-06-14 | House | To Governor 6/16/16 - House Journal |
2016-06-14 | Senate | To Governor 6/16/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-06-16 | Senate | To Governor 6/16/16 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-06-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-06-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-06-14 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 730) |
2016-06-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 729) |
2016-06-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 38) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 38) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate reconsidererd concurrence |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate reconsidered passage of bill (Voice vote) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate reconsidered effective date |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate requests return of bill from House |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 33) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-06-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-06-13 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 720) |
2016-06-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 719) |
2016-06-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-06-13 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 718) |
2016-06-13 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-06-13 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 717) |
2016-06-13 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 716) |
2016-06-13 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2016-06-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-06-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-06-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-06-12 | House | Immediate consideration |
2016-06-12 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-06-11 | House | To House Finance |
2016-06-11 | House | To Finance |
2016-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 26) |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 25) |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-06-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |