WV SB1008 | 2011 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-29 - Chapter 5, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reapportioning congressional districts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reapportioning congressional districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-08-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 8) (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 8) (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 538) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 537) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 536) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 3) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-05 - Senate - Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 2) (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-08-29 Chapter 5, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2011
2011-08-05 Approved by Governor 8/18/11 - House Journal
2011-08-05 Approved by Governor 8/18/11 - Senate Journal
2011-08-18 Approved by Governor 8/18/11
2011-08-05 To Governor 8/17/11 - House Journal
2011-08-05 To Governor 8/17/11 - Senate Journal
2011-08-17 To Governor 8/17/11
2011-08-05 Completed legislative action
2011-08-05 House received Senate message
2011-08-05 Communicated to House
2011-08-05 Effective from passage (Roll No. 8)
2011-08-05 Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 8)
2011-08-05 House Message received
2011-08-05 Communicated to Senate
2011-08-05 Effective from passage (Roll No. 538)
2011-08-05 Passed House (Roll No. 537)
2011-08-05 Read 3rd time
2011-08-05 Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2011-08-05 Read 2nd time
2011-08-05 Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 536)
2011-08-05 Read 1st time
2011-08-05 Immediate consideration
2011-08-05 Reference dispensed
2011-08-05 Introduced in House
2011-08-05 Ordered to House
2011-08-05 Effective from passage (Roll No. 4)
2011-08-05 Passed Senate (Roll No. 4)
2011-08-05 Read 3rd time
2011-08-05 Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 3)
2011-08-05 On 3rd reading
2011-08-05 Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 2)
2011-08-05 Read 2nd time
2011-08-05 On 2nd reading
2011-08-04 Read 1st time
2011-08-04 Immediate consideration
2011-08-04 On 1st reading
2011-08-04 Reported do pass
2011-08-04 Originating in Senate Select Committee on Redistricting

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
122bAmended CodeCitation Text
123Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=1008&year=2011&sessiontype=1X&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb1008%20enr.htm&yr=2011&sesstype=1X&i=1008
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb1008%20org.htm&yr=2011&sesstype=1X&i=1008
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/senate/08050002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/senate/08050003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/senate/08050004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/house/00536.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/house/00537.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/house/00538.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2011/1X/votes/senate/08050008.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback