WV SB1008 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - Committed to Education on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - Committed to Education on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require compulsory comprehensive health screening for students entering public school for the first time in this state and students entering third, sixth and ninth grades. Use of developmental screening for determination of advanced abilities is eliminated.
Title
Relating to compulsory comprehensive health screenings for students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Committed to Education on 2nd reading | |
2010-05-18 | Read 1st time | |
2010-05-18 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-05-18 | Introduced in House | |
2010-05-18 | Ordered to House | |
2010-05-18 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) | |
2010-05-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-05-18 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 7) | |
2010-05-18 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-05-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-05-18 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-05-18 | Reported do pass | |
2010-05-18 | Having been read 2nd time, prior proceedings, 5/17/10 | |
2010-05-17 | On 2nd reading to Finance | |
2010-05-17 | Read 1st time | |
2010-05-17 | On 1st reading | |
2010-05-17 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-05-17 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2010-05-13 | To Education | |
2010-05-13 | On 2nd reading to Education then Finance | |
2010-05-13 | Read 1st time | |
2010-05-13 | On 1st reading | |
2010-05-13 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-05-13 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-05-13 | To Education then Finance | |
2010-05-13 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB106 (Same As) 2010-05-19 - Committed to Finance on 2nd reading
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |