WV SB1006 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing WV Board of Physical Therapy to conduct criminal background checks on initial license applicants
Title
Authorizing WV Board of Physical Therapy to conduct criminal background checks on initial license applicants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 791) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 790) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 789) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 6) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 790) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 789) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 6) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/29/19 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/24/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-05-24 | Senate | To Governor 5/24/19 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-05-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-05-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 791) |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 790) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 789) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-05-20 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-05-20 | House | Reference dispensed |
2019-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 6) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB104 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Tabled