WV SB1006 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Chapter 6, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Chapter 6, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the funding for the State Road Fund. The bill increases Division of Motor Vehicles administrative fees and motor fuel excise taxes, increase rate of consumers sales and service tax on sales of motor vehicles, increases the minimum average wholesale price of motor fuels for purposes of the five percent variable fuel tax on a certain date, and increases administrative DMV fees every five years on September 1 based on the US Department of Labor, Bureau of Labor Statistics most current Consumer Price Index, imposing annual registration fee for certain alternative fuel vehicles and specified effective dates.Â
Title
Increasing funding for State Road Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 52) (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 52) (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 661) (Y: 49 N: 40 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 660) (Y: 42 N: 47 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-16 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 675) (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 674) (Y: 54 N: 32 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 673) (Y: 60 N: 24 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 663) (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 662) (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 659) (Y: 31 N: 58 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 52) (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 661) (Y: 49 N: 40 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 660) (Y: 42 N: 47 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-16 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 675) (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 674) (Y: 54 N: 32 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 673) (Y: 60 N: 24 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 663) (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 662) (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 659) (Y: 31 N: 58 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Chapter 6, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2017 |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/22/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/22/17 |
2017-06-26 | House | Approved by Governor 6/22/17 - House Journal |
2017-06-26 | Senate | To Governor 6/19/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-06-19 | Senate | To Governor 6/19/17 |
2017-06-26 | House | To Governor 6/19/17 - House Journal |
2017-06-16 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-06-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-06-16 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 675) |
2017-06-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 674) |
2017-06-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 673) |
2017-06-16 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 52) |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 52) |
2017-06-16 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-06-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-06-16 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 663) |
2017-06-16 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-06-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 662) |
2017-06-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-06-16 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No. 661) |
2017-06-16 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2017-06-16 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 660) |
2017-06-16 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2017-06-16 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 659) |
2017-06-16 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2017-06-16 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-06-16 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2017-06-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-06-15 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 6/16/17 |
2017-06-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-06-14 | House | Amendments pending |
2017-06-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-06-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-06-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-06-13 | House | Immediate consideration |
2017-06-13 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-05-24 | House | To House Finance |
2017-05-24 | House | To Finance |
2017-05-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rucker Floor amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Hall Amendment to Rucker amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rucker Floor amendment reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 5/23/17 with right to amend |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 5/22/17 with right to amend |
2017-05-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB108 (Similar To) 2017-05-16 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 14C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 15 | 18b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 15 | 3c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 10 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 10 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 10 | 3c | New Code | See Bill Text |
17A | 2 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 3 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 4 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 4 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 4A | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 2 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 2 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 2 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 2 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 2 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 5A | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17D | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |