WV SB1004 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter 14, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter 14, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove references to "mentally retarded" and "mental retardation" in health care-related legislation and replace those references with "intellectually disabled," "individual with an intellectual disability" and "intellectual disability.
Title
Replacing references to "mentally retarded" with "intellectually disabled"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 451) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 450) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 450) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Chapter 14, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Approved by Governor 6/3/10 - House Journal | |
2010-05-19 | Approved by Governor 6/3/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-06-03 | Approved by Governor 6/3/10 | |
2010-05-19 | To Governor 5/21/10 - House Journal | |
2010-05-19 | To Governor 5/21/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-05-21 | To Governor 5/21/10 | |
2010-05-15 | House Message received | |
2010-05-14 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-05-14 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-05-14 | Passed House (Roll No. 451) | |
2010-05-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-05-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-05-14 | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 450) | |
2010-05-14 | Read 1st time | |
2010-05-14 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-05-14 | Reference dispensed | |
2010-05-14 | Introduced in House | |
2010-05-14 | Ordered to House | |
2010-05-14 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) | |
2010-05-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-05-14 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 5) | |
2010-05-14 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-05-14 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-05-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-05-13 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2010-05-13 | On 2nd reading to Judiciary | |
2010-05-13 | Read 1st time | |
2010-05-13 | On 1st reading | |
2010-05-13 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-05-13 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-05-13 | To Judiciary | |
2010-05-13 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB102 (Same As) 2010-05-14 - Tabled on 2nd reading, House Calendar