WV SB1003 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter 15, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter 15, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to rename conservation officers as natural resources police officers, to rename the chief conservation officer as the chief natural resources police officer and to clarify that certain provisions of the West Virginia Code are inapplicable to the pensions of natural resource police officers paid through the Public Employees Retirement System.
Title
Renaming conservation officers natural resources police officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-16 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 456) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 455) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 455) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Chapter 15, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Approved by Governor 6/3/10 - House Journal | |
2010-05-19 | Approved by Governor 6/3/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-06-03 | Approved by Governor 6/3/10 | |
2010-05-19 | To Governor 5/21/10 - House Journal | |
2010-05-19 | To Governor 5/21/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-05-21 | To Governor 5/21/10 | |
2010-05-17 | House Message received | |
2010-05-16 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-05-16 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-05-16 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 456) | |
2010-05-16 | Passed House (Roll No. 455) | |
2010-05-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-05-16 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-05-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-05-15 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-05-14 | Read 1st time | |
2010-05-14 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-05-14 | Reference dispensed | |
2010-05-14 | Introduced in House | |
2010-05-14 | Ordered to House | |
2010-05-14 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) | |
2010-05-14 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) | |
2010-05-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-05-14 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 1) | |
2010-05-14 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-05-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-05-14 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-05-14 | Reported do pass | |
2010-05-13 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2010-05-13 | On 2nd reading to Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-05-13 | Read 1st time | |
2010-05-13 | On 1st reading | |
2010-05-13 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-05-13 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-05-13 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-05-13 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB103 (Same As) 2010-05-16 - Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar