WV SB1 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 133, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing access to career education and workforce training

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing access to career education and workforce training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 387) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 484) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 476) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 475) (Y: 36 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 474) (Y: 27 N: 69 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 473) (Y: 14 N: 81 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 472) (Y: 41 N: 54 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 471) (Y: 40 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 470) (Y: 43 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Plymale Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 20) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Prezioso Floor amendments rejected (Roll No. 19) (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 133, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-20SenateTo Governor 3/20/19
2019-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 387)
2019-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-06HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-06HousePassed House (Roll No. 484)
2019-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-05HouseAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 476)
2019-03-05HouseAmendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 475)
2019-03-05HouseAmendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 474)
2019-03-05HouseAmendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 473)
2019-03-05HouseAmendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
2019-03-05HouseAmendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 472)
2019-03-05HouseAmendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 471)
2019-03-05HouseAmendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 470)
2019-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-05HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-04HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-22HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-22HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2019-01-24HouseTo House Education
2019-01-24HouseTo Education then Finance
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-23SenateOrdered to House
2019-01-23SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 21)
2019-01-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-01-23SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-01-22SenatePlymale Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 20)
2019-01-22SenatePrezioso Floor amendments rejected (Roll No. 19)
2019-01-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-01-22SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-21SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-21SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-18SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2019-01-16SenateTo Finance
2019-01-16SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2019-01-09SenateTo Education
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateTo Education then Finance
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1826Amended CodeCitation Text
182E11New CodeSee Bill Text
189A2Amended CodeCitation Text
18B3C16New CodeSee Bill Text
18C91New CodeSee Bill Text
18C92New CodeSee Bill Text
18C93New CodeSee Bill Text
18C94New CodeSee Bill Text
18C95New CodeSee Bill Text
18C96New CodeSee Bill Text
2914aNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=1&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB1%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=1
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB1%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=1
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB1%20SUB2.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=1
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB1%20SUB2%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=1
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/01-22-0019.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/01-22-0020.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/01-23-0021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00470.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00471.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00472.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00473.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00474.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00475.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00476.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00484.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0387.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback