WV HR7 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-18)
Status: Passed on February 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-29 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-18)
Status: Passed on February 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-29 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating a single state funeral to be held upon the death of the last living Medal of Honor recipient from World War II
Title
Designating a single state funeral to be held upon the death of the last living Medal of Honor recipient from World War II
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-29 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-29 | House | Adopted, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2020-02-29 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2020-02-29 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | Be adopted |
2020-02-27 | House | To House Rules |
2020-02-27 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2020-01-23 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-23 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Rules |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |