WV HR6 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 72-20)
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 72-20)
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the Army Corps of Engineers to support hydroelectric power generation at the Summersville Dam.
Title
Urging the Army Corps of Engineers to support hydroelectric power generation at the Summersville Dam.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-10 | House | Adopted, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2022-02-10 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Be adopted |
2022-01-27 | House | To House Rules |
2022-01-27 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | To House Energy and Manufacturing |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-18 | House | To Energy and Manufacturing then Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |