WV HR6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the importance of West Virginia’s energy resources and critical energy infrastructure to support economic development and national security
Title
Recognizing the importance of West Virginia’s energy resources and critical energy infrastructure to support economic development and national security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | House | Adopted, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-07 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Be adopted |
2019-01-30 | House | To House Rules |
2019-01-30 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-01-17 | House | To House Energy |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-17 | House | To Energy then Rules |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |