WV HJR28 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this resolution is to add a new section to Article III of the West Virginia Constitution, to secure a protection from medically-assisted suicide or euthanasia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protection from medically-assisted suicide or euthanasia in West Virginia Amendment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 750) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 511) (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 183) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2024-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2024-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2024-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and adopted (Roll No. 750)
2024-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2024-03-09SenateSenate requests House to concur
2024-03-09SenateAdopted by Senate (Roll No. 511)
2024-03-09SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2024-03-09SenateFinance committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2024-03-09SenateJud. committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2024-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2024-03-08SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 3/8/2024 with right to amend
2024-03-08SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2024-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2024-03-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2024-03-06SenateRead 1st time
2024-03-06SenateOn 1st reading
2024-03-05SenateReported be adopted, with amendment
2024-03-04SenateTo Finance
2024-03-04SenateReported be adopted, with amendment, but first to Finance
2024-02-16SenateTo Judiciary
2024-02-16SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2024-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2024-02-15HouseCommunicated to Senate
2024-02-15HouseAdopted by House (Roll No. 183)
2024-02-15HouseRead 3rd time
2024-02-15HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2024-02-14HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-13HouseRead 1st time
2024-02-13HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-12HouseBy substitute, be adopted
2024-02-08HouseTo House Rules
2024-02-08HouseBe adopted, but first to Rules
2024-01-31HouseTo House Judiciary
2024-01-31HouseIntroduced in House
2024-01-31HouseTo Judiciary then Rules
2024-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2024&sessiontype=RS&input4=28&billtype=JR&houseorig=H&btype=res
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hjr28%20intr.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=28&houseorig=H&billtype=JR
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hjr28%20sub.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=28&houseorig=H&billtype=JR
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hjr28%20sub%20enr.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=28&houseorig=H&billtype=JR
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/com_amends/hjr28%20s%20jud1%20am%20_1%203-3.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/com_amends/hjr28%20s%20fin%20am%20_1%203-5.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hjr28%20sfa%20tarr%20_2%203-9.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hjr28%20sfa%20tarr%20_2%203-9%20adopetd.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/com_amends/hjr28%20s%20fin%20am%20_1%203-5%20withdrawn.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/com_amends/hjr28%20s%20jud1%20am%20_1%203-3%20withdrawn.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/house/00183.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0511.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/house/00750.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback