WV HJR102 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this resolution is to propose a Constitutional Amendment to clarify that the rules and policies promulgated by the State Board of Education, are subject to legislative review, approval, amendments, or rejection. The proposed amendment would be voted on in the 2022 general election.
Title
Clarifying that the policy-making and rule-making authority of the State Board of Education is subject to legislative review, approval, amendment, or rejection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and adopted (Roll No. 357) (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 244) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 194) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 244) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 194) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-03 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and adopted (Roll No. 357) |
2022-03-03 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 244) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/25/2022 with right to amend |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Motion to lay over on 3rd reading adopted (voice vote) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Motion for immediate consideration |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 194) |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2022-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | Be adopted |
2022-01-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-20 | House | Be adopted, but first to Judiciary |
2022-01-13 | House | To House Education |
2022-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-13 | House | To Education then Judiciary |
2022-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |