WV HCR94 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR94

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Calling for the construction of a licensed Off Highway Vehicle semi-contiguous trail to parallel the Appalachian Hiking Trail on the western side

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calling for the construction of a licensed Off Highway Vehicle semi-contiguous trail to parallel the Appalachian Hiking Trail on the western side

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseAdopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
2020-03-07HouseReported by the Clerk
2020-03-07HouseReported by the Clerk
2020-03-07HouseOn Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
2020-03-06HouseBe adopted
2020-02-27HouseTo House Rules
2020-02-27HouseBe adopted, but first to Rules
2020-02-17HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2020-02-17HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-17HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
2020-02-17HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HCR94 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - To House Rules

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback