WV HCR84 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Referred to Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Referred to Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Navy, Water Tender 3rd Class, V-6, Lewis Glenn Mills Memorial Boulevard
Title
U. S. Navy, Water Tender 3rd Class, V-6, Lewis Glenn Mills Memorial Boulevard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2022-02-24 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-02-24 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2022-02-23 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Be adopted |
2022-02-18 | House | To House Rules |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-18 | House | To Rules |
2022-02-18 | House | Filed for introduction |