WV HCR78 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting an examination of juvenile proceedings
Title
Requesting an examination of juvenile proceedings
Sponsors
Del. Christopher Toney [R] | Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] |
Del. Joshua Higginbotham [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | To Rules |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported be adopted, but first to Rules |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Rules |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2021-03-31 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Be adopted |
2021-03-26 | House | To House Rules |
2021-03-26 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2021-03-26 | House | Originating in House Education |