WV HCR77 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-36)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-10 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-36)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-10 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring that the month of September be proclaimed as Take Pride in America Month beginning with September, 2012
Title
Declaring that the month of September be proclaimed as Take Pride in America Month beginning with September, 2012
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-09 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-09 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-09 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-09 | On Unfinished Business | |
2012-03-08 | Reported be adopted | |
2012-02-24 | To Government Organization | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-23 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-23 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-23 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2012-02-23 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2012-02-22 | Be adopted | |
2012-02-17 | To House Rules | |
2012-02-17 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-17 | To Rules | |
2012-02-17 | Filed for introduction |