WV HCR76 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Marine Corps LCpl Michael Linn Cooper Memorial Bridge
Title
U. S. Marine Corps LCpl Michael Linn Cooper Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rowe [D] | Del. Andrew Robinson [D] | Del. Mike Pushkin [D] | Del. Andrew Byrd [D] |
Del. Charlotte Lane [R] | Del. Brad White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2018-03-08 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2018-03-07 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2018-03-07 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | By substitute, be adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | To House Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-20 | House | To Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Filed for introduction |