WV HCR70 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-02 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-02 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Marine Sgt. Stephen E. Drummond Memorial Bridge
Title
U. S. Marine Sgt. Stephen E. Drummond Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2018-03-02 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2018-03-01 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2018-02-28 | House | Be adopted |
2018-02-27 | House | To House Rules |
2018-02-27 | House | By substitute, be adopted, but first to Rules |
2018-02-12 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2018-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-12 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Rules |
2018-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |