WV HCR67 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR67

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

U. S. Army CPL Wilson B. Lambert, Jr. Memorial Road

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

U. S. Army CPL Wilson B. Lambert, Jr. Memorial Road

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2018-03-08SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2018-03-08SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-07HouseAdopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
2018-03-07HouseReported by the Clerk
2018-03-07HouseOn Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
2018-03-06HouseBe adopted
2018-02-27HouseTo House Rules
2018-02-27HouseBy substitute, be adopted, but first to Rules
2018-02-12HouseTo House Roads and Transportation
2018-02-12HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-12HouseTo Roads and Transportation then Rules
2018-02-12HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HCR67 (Carry Over) 2017-03-08 - To House Roads and Transportation

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback