WV HCR63 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Army SSG Boggs G. Collins Memorial Road
Title
U. S. Army SSG Boggs G. Collins Memorial Road
Sponsors
Del. William Hartman [D] | Del. Cody Thompson [D] | Del. Isaac Sponaugle [D] | Del. Margaret Staggers [D] |
Del. Nathan Brown [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Adopted by House (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-08 | House | Be adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | To House Rules |
2019-02-26 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-02-11 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-11 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |