WV HCR57 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House received Senate message
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House received Senate message
Summary
The "Lance Corporal John Darrell Smith Memorial Bridge"
Title
The "Lance Corporal John Darrell Smith Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | House received Senate message | |
2011-02-22 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-02-22 | Communicated to House | |
2011-02-22 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2011-02-22 | On Unfinished Business | |
2011-02-21 | Reported be adopted | |
2011-02-14 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-14 | House Message received | |
2011-02-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-11 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2011-02-11 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2011-02-11 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2011-02-10 | Be adopted | |
2011-02-08 | To House Rules | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-08 | To Rules | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2011&sessiontype=RS&input4=57&billtype=CR&houseorig=H&btype=res |