WV HCR55 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR55

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Pendleton County Veterans Killed in Action Memorial Bridge

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pendleton County Veterans Killed in Action Memorial Bridge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-07SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-07SenateReported be adopted
2020-02-20SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2020-02-20SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-19HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-19HouseAdopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
2020-02-19HouseReported by the Clerk
2020-02-19HouseOn Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
2020-02-18HouseBe adopted
2020-02-14HouseTo House Rules
2020-02-14HouseBe adopted, but first to Rules
2020-02-03HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-03HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
2020-02-03HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HCR55 (Carry Over) 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback