WV HCR5 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
James “Big Jim” Shaffer Memorial Bridge
Title
James “Big Jim” Shaffer Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2022-03-04 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-03-04 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-03 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | Be adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | To House Rules |
2022-03-01 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2022-01-12 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-12 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |