WV HCR45 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
U.S. Army SFC Bob L. VandeLinde Bridge
Title
U.S. Army SFC Bob L. VandeLinde Bridge
Sponsors
Del. Carol Miller [R] | Del. Kevin Craig [D] | Del. Jeff Eldridge [D] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] |
Del. Jim Morgan [D] | Del. Larry Barker [D] | Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2014-02-21 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-20 | House | Adopted by House, Daily Calendar (Voice vote) |
2014-02-20 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2014-02-20 | House | On Unfinished Business, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-19 | House | By substitute, be adopted |
2014-01-24 | House | To House Rules |
2014-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-24 | House | To Rules |
2014-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |