WV HCR43 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Army CSM Hugh H. ‘Smokey’ Stover Memorial Road
Title
U. S. Army CSM Hugh H. ‘Smokey’ Stover Memorial Road
Sponsors
Del. Christopher Toney [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Zachery Maynard [R] |
Del. Mick Bates [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-03-30 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2021-03-29 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | By substitute, be adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-11 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed for introduction |