WV HCR43 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Army Air Corps T SGT Ralph H. Ray Bridge
Title
U. S. Army Air Corps T SGT Ralph H. Ray Bridge
Sponsors
Del. Andrew Byrd [D] | Del. Moore Capito [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Del. Doug Skaff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-02-15 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Be adopted |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Rules |
2019-02-12 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-01-30 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-30 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |