WV HCR41 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Halstead Brothers WWII Veterans Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Halstead Brothers WWII Veterans Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2021-04-06SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2021-04-06SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-04-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-04-05HouseAdopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
2021-04-05HouseReported by the Clerk
2021-04-05HouseOn Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
2021-04-02HouseBe adopted
2021-04-01HouseTo House Rules
2021-04-01HouseBe adopted, but first to Rules
2021-03-11HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2021-03-11HouseIntroduced in House
2021-03-11HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
2021-03-11HouseFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback