WV HCR41 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Major Martin Robison Delany Memorial Bridge
Title
Major Martin Robison Delany Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-04-04 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-03 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2017-04-03 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2017-04-01 | House | Be adopted |
2017-03-28 | House | To House Rules |
2017-03-28 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2017-03-02 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-02 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Rules |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed for introduction |