WV HCR37 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Army PFC Carl. J. Osburn Bridge
Title
U. S. Army PFC Carl. J. Osburn Bridge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - Adopted by House (Roll No. 247) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Adopted by House (Roll No. 247) |
2024-02-21 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | Postponed on Unfinished Business, Special Calendar, until 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | Be adopted |
2024-02-15 | House | To House Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | By substitute, be adopted, but first to Rules |
2024-01-17 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-17 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2024-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |