WV HCR33 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Norman A. and Carrie G. Silver Memorial Bridge

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Norman A. and Carrie G. Silver Memorial Bridge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-02HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-04-01SenateCompleted legislative action
2021-04-01SenateCommunicated to House
2021-04-01SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2021-04-01SenateImmediate consideration
2021-04-01SenateReported be adopted
2021-03-26SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2021-03-26SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2021-03-26SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-03-25HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-25HouseAdopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
2021-03-25HouseReported by the Clerk
2021-03-25HouseOn Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
2021-03-24HouseBe adopted
2021-03-19HouseTo House Rules
2021-03-19HouseBe adopted, but first to Rules
2021-03-09HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced in House
2021-03-09HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
2021-03-09HouseFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback