WV HCR30 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To name the U.S. Army Pvt. Dallis H. Johnson WWII Memorial Bridge.
Title
U.S. Army Pvt. Dallis H. Johnson WWII Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-02-25 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-25 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported be adopted, with amendments |
2022-02-11 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-02-11 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-10 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2022-02-10 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Be adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | To House Rules |
2022-02-08 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2022-01-27 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2022-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-27 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |