WV HCR28 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U.S.M.C. Cpl Andrew Ryan White Memorial Bridge
Title
U.S.M.C. Cpl Andrew Ryan White Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-03-02 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-29 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2020-02-29 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2020-02-29 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | Be adopted |
2020-02-27 | House | To House Rules |
2020-02-27 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2020-01-23 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-23 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |