WV HCR23 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR23

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

U. S. Army Spec. 4, Roger Dale Griffith Memorial Bridge

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

U. S. Army Spec. 4, Roger Dale Griffith Memorial Bridge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-07SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-07SenateReported be adopted
2020-03-02SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2020-03-02SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-29HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-29HouseAdopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
2020-02-29HouseReported by the Clerk
2020-02-29HouseOn Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
2020-02-28HouseBe adopted
2020-02-27HouseTo House Rules
2020-02-27HouseBy substitute, be adopted, but first to Rules
2020-01-21HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-21HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
2020-01-21HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HCR23 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - House received Senate message

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback