WV HCR23 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Army SGT Rodney David King and U. S. Army SGT James Harris King Memorial Bridge
Title
U. S. Army SGT Rodney David King and U. S. Army SGT James Harris King Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-02-15 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Be adopted |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Rules |
2019-02-12 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-01-21 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-21 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |