WV HCR19 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Gold Star Families Highway
Title
Gold Star Families Highway
Sponsors
Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Tom Bibby [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] |
Del. John Paul Hott [R] | Del. Scott Cadle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-02-20 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2020-02-19 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Be adopted |
2020-02-14 | House | To House Rules |
2020-02-14 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2020-01-20 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2020-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-20 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2020-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |