WV HCR104 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 63-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the expiration of certain emergency orders issued during the coronavirus pandemic declared on March 16, 2020 in West Virginia

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the expiration of certain emergency orders issued during the coronavirus pandemic declared on March 16, 2020 in West Virginia

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 494) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenateTo Rules
2021-04-09SenateTo Rules
2021-04-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-04-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-04-07HouseAdopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 494)
2021-04-07HouseReported by the Clerk
2021-04-07HouseOn Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
2021-04-06HouseReference dispensed
2021-04-06HouseImmediate consideration
2021-04-06HouseIntroduced in House

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback