WV HCR101 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - To Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the Governor’s Task Force on Public Employee Insurance Agency Stability to review means and methods of including medical facilities
Title
Requesting the Governor’s Task Force on Public Employee Insurance Agency Stability to review means and methods of including medical facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | To Rules |
2018-03-08 | Senate | To Rules |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2018-03-07 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2018-03-07 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Be adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | To House Rules |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-03-05 | House | To Rules |
2018-03-05 | House | Filed for introduction |