WV HCR100 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting study on how Local Health Departments are funded and supported
Title
Requesting study on how Local Health Departments are funded and supported
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | To Rules |
2021-04-08 | Senate | To Rules |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2021-04-07 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Be adopted |
2021-04-05 | House | To House Rules |
2021-04-05 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2021-04-05 | House | Originating in House Health and Human Resources |