WV HCR10 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
John Cameron Brown Bridge
Title
John Cameron Brown Bridge
Sponsors
Del. George Ambler [R] | Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. Ricky Moye [D] | Del. Eric Householder [R] |
Del. Ruth Rowan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported be adopted, with amendments and title amendment |
2017-03-23 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-03-23 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2017-03-22 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | Be adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | To House Rules |
2017-03-15 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2017-02-13 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-13 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Rules |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |